Global Patent Index - EP 0714153 B1

EP 0714153 B1 2000-05-24 - Lamp holder with integrated component

Title (en)

Lamp holder with integrated component

Title (de)

Lampenfassung mit integrierbarem Vorschaltglied

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe avec composant intégré

Publication

EP 0714153 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117861 A

Priority

DE 9418873 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714153A2] The housing (1) of the lampholder has an opening (2) for introduction of a lamp whose centre contact engages with a leaf spring (8) while the rim of its base is contacted by an earthing spring (7). The live wire and earth wire of a power supply are terminated on spaced-apart contacts (6,5) and retained by screws (4). The ends of the leaf spring and live contact are provided with dents (11) for the leads of a voltage-dropping resistor (9). The diode (10) is inserted between the earth contact and the lower end of the earthing spring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/945; H01R 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/945 (2006.01); H01R 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/945 (2013.01); H01R 33/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9418873 U1 19950119; EP 0714153 A2 19960529; EP 0714153 A3 19980114; EP 0714153 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508388

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990302

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980205

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI