Global Patent Index - EP 0714223 B1

EP 0714223 B1 2001-02-21 - Radiant heater

Title (en)

Radiant heater

Title (de)

Strahlungsheizkörper

Title (fr)

Corps de chauffe rayonnant

Publication

EP 0714223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116539 A

Priority

DE 4438648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714223A2] The appts. includes a basic heating zone (21) which, in operation, is continually heated. It also has at least one additional heating zone (22) which can be switched on as required. The additional zone (22) is adapted to form an extension of the basic zone (21) providing a larger total heating surface (23). The heating zones (21, 22) are provided in a carrier with an insulator (13) on which heat conductors (18) are arranged. The insulator surrounds the total heating surface (23) in the form of an insulating outer edge (15). The basic zone and the additional zone (21, 22), when combined, have a greater total power than the basic heating zone (21) alone. A temperature limiter (30) has a temperature probe (36) which extends over the basic zone (21). The flat basic and additional zones (21, 22) are arranged such that they provide overlapping radiation. When combined, the basic and additional zones preferably are connected in parallel. The boundary (19) of the total heating surface (21, 22) is formed by a rib whose height is at most half, but preferably not less than an quarter of the distance between the surface of the insulator (13) and the underside of the cooking surface (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/48 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/48 (2013.01); H05B 3/74 (2013.01); H01H 2037/326 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4438648 A1 19960502; AT 199295 T 20010315; EP 0714223 A2 19960529; EP 0714223 A3 19960710; EP 0714223 B1 20010221; ES 2156177 T3 20010616

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141021

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141020

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509035

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131104

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011020

2001-08-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156177 T3

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509035 20010329

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19951020

2001-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199295 T 20010315

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

1997-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERAETEBAU GMBH

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961116

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1996-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951020

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1996-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951020

1996-05-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951020