Global Patent Index - EP 0714478 B1

EP 0714478 B1 2000-04-26 - THROTTLE VALVE DEVICE

Title (en)

THROTTLE VALVE DEVICE

Title (de)

DROSSELKLAPPENVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CLAPET DE CARBURATEUR

Publication

EP 0714478 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95923335 A

Priority

  • DE 9409891 U
  • DE 19512916 A
  • EP 9502334 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5752484A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/02334 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 13, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 13, 1996 PCT Filed Jun. 16, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/35440 PCT Pub. Date Dec. 28, 1995The invention relates to a throttle valve device including a housing (4; 54; 54'; 98), a throttle valve spindle (3; 53; 53'; 99) on which a throttle valve (2; 52; 52'; 100) movable in the housing (4; 54; 54'; 98) between a first air passage chamber (62; 62'; 92) and a second such chamber (63; 63'; 103) leading to the vehicle engine is held in at least one closed position (DS), an idling position (MS) and a full-throttle position (VS) and a control unit (11; 61; 61'; 107) having at least one control motor unit (5; 55; 55'; 91) and connected to the throttle valve spindle (3; 53; 53'; 99). The second air passage chamber (63; 63'; 103) is connected to a back-up air control device (2, 3, 8, 9, 10, LHP1; 52, 55, 58, LHP2; 52', 55', 58', LHP3; 95, 102) by which enough air can be fed to the engine in the event of the breakdown of the control motor unit (5; 55; 55'; 91) to allow the vehicle movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/1065 (2013.01); F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 9/10 (2013.01); F02D 11/107 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0269 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5752484 A 19980519; EP 0714478 A1 19960605; EP 0714478 B1 20000426; ES 2147852 T3 20001001; WO 9535440 A2 19951228; WO 9535440 A3 19960229

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090616

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147852 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508224 20000531

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOVELTY SERVICE ING. DI IORIO G.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AB ELEKTRONIK GMBH

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980305

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960214

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE