Global Patent Index - EP 0714496 B1

EP 0714496 B1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE FOR MANOEUVRING AN AIR-CONTROL MECHANISM IN A FURNACE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MANOEUVRING AN AIR-CONTROL MECHANISM IN A FURNACE

Title (de)

BEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN LUFTSTEUERORGAN IN EINEM OFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE MANOEUVRER UN MECANISME DE REGULATION D'ARRIVEE D'AIR DANS UN FOURNEAU

Publication

EP 0714496 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94925059 A

Priority

  • SE 9400730 W
  • SE 9302731 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9506226A1] The invention relates to a device for manoeuvring an air-control mechanism (1) in a furnace provided with a number of air-supply ports (3) in its walls (2), in which the said ports (3) communicate with an air box (4) and in which each port (3) is provided with a control member (5) which can be axially displaced forwards and backwards for positional adjustment relative to the said port for the purpose of determining the volume of air passing through the port, and in which the said control member (5) is additionally arranged to be moved past the set air-regulating position, so that its end (10) penetrates the port (3) in order to remove coatings which have been deposited in the said port, in which the control member (5) is connected to a mechanical jack screw (13) for the realization of its axial motions both for air-regulating positional adjustment and for removal of the coatings, in which the said jack screw (13) is driven by an electric motor (14). The axial position of the control member (5) is here clearly determined by the gear ratio of the jack screw (13) and the rotation speed and running time of the motor (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 1/00; D21C 11/12; F23G 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 11/12 (2006.01); F23J 3/00 (2006.01); F23L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 3/00 (2013.01); D21C 11/12 (2013.01); F23L 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9506226 A1 19950302; AT 191271 T 20000415; AU 7510494 A 19950321; BR 9407451 A 19961112; CA 2168220 A1 19950302; DE 69423765 D1 20000504; EP 0714496 A1 19960605; EP 0714496 B1 20000329; ES 2146659 T3 20000816; PT 714496 E 20000929; SE 502092 C2 19950814; SE 9302731 D0 19930823; SE 9302731 L 19950224

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040811

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-02-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-08-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-08-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146659 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423765 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR PT

2000-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191271 T 20000415

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1996-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KVAERNER PULPING AB

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960115

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR PT