Global Patent Index - EP 0714601 B1

EP 0714601 B1 2000-08-30 - Residual control of parasites by long-acting shampoo formulations

Title (en)

Residual control of parasites by long-acting shampoo formulations

Title (de)

Dauerhafte Kontrolle von Parasiten mittels langwirkender Shampoo-Formulierungen

Title (fr)

Contrôle résiduel des parasites avec des formulations de shampooing à longue durée

Publication

EP 0714601 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95402643 A

Priority

US 34552694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714601A1] The invention relates to shampoo compositions comprising a detergent and at least one active compound selected from juvenile hormone-like nitrogen containing heterocyclic compounds, other insect growth regulators such as methoprene or fenoxycarb, synthetic pyrethroids and mixtures thereof, wherein the dose of the active compound is sufficient for leaving on the haircoat of a warm-blooded animal after rinse out the shampoo an ovicidally and/or insecticidally and/or acaricidally residual effective amount against ectoparasites of said compound. Such shampoo compositions are useful for a residual control of ectoparasites on warm-blooded animals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/40; A01N 25/16; A01N 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 35/06 (2006.01); A01N 25/16 (2006.01); A01N 43/00 (2006.01); A01N 43/40 (2006.01); A01N 53/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61Q 17/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/40 (2013.01); A01N 25/16 (2013.01); A01N 53/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/49 (2013.01); A61K 8/4926 (2013.01); A61K 8/4953 (2013.01); A61K 8/4966 (2013.01); A61Q 17/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 43/40 + A01N 2300/00
  2. A01N 53/00 + A01N 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714601 A1 19960605; EP 0714601 B1 20000830; AU 3781195 A 19960606; AU 715843 B2 20000210; CA 2163319 A1 19960529; DE 69518608 D1 20001005; DE 69518608 T2 20010426; JP H08208408 A 19960813

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031123

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-11-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031123

2003-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518608 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

1998-03-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIRBAC

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970715

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961018

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL