Global Patent Index - EP 0714650 B1

EP 0714650 B1 2000-01-26 - Massage device

Title (en)

Massage device

Title (de)

Massagegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de massage perfectionné

Publication

EP 0714650 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95203149 A

Priority

FR 9414491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714650A1] The massager consists of a motor with a drive shaft (15) to rotate a massaging head (26) carrying the massaging elements. The massaging head has a central channel (27) for fitting onto the motor shaft and supports (22,19) for linking the two. The supports are in the form of upper (22) and lower (19) stops which allow a relative axial movement of the massaging head and shaft, while the axial channel (27) in the head and the shaft are shaped to allow the head to be disposed at various angles to the shaft. Radial and axial elastic thrust elements (20,21) hold the massaging head in a stable position and to allow its angular and axial movements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 15/0085 (2013.01); A61H 2015/0057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714650 A1 19960605; EP 0714650 B1 20000126; DE 69514764 D1 20000302; DE 69514764 T2 20000928; ES 2143588 T3 20000516; FR 2727311 A1 19960531; FR 2727311 B1 19970214; US 5769798 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081118

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081117

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143588 T3

2000-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. ING. FRANCO RASTELLI

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514764 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990414

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960919

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT