Global Patent Index - EP 0714703 B1

EP 0714703 B1 2000-02-09 - A grinding process and a drum lining

Title (en)

A grinding process and a drum lining

Title (de)

Mahlverfahren und Auskleidung für Mahltrommel

Title (fr)

Procédé de broyage et revêtement pour tambour de broyeur

Publication

EP 0714703 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95850200 A

Priority

SE 9404159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714703A1] A method of grinding a batch of material, particularly ceramic material, together with a multiple of grinding media in a rotary mill drum which includes a polymer lining having elongated lifting devices which are positioned axially in the drum and which protrude radially into the drum interior. With the intention of making grinding more effective and of reducing grinding time, it is proposed in accordance with the invention that the method will comprise the steps of: rotating the drum at a constant speed in a first direction of rotation during a first time interval, so that grinding media from said grinding media multiple are brought into contact with a high-lifting side of the lifting devices as the drum rotates, to grind or disintegrate the material with a larger crush proportion and a smaller fine-grinding proportion; and - rotating the drum at said constant speed in a rotational direction opposite to the first rotational direction in a second time interval following said first time interval , so that grinding media in said grinding media multiple are brought into contact with a low-lifting side of said lifting devices opposite to the high-lifting side thereof, so as to grind the material with a smaller crush proportion and a larger fine-grinding proportion. The invention also relates to a mill lining for use with such a method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/24; B02C 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/00 (2006.01); B02C 17/22 (2006.01); B02C 17/24 (2006.01); B24B 31/02 (2006.01); B24B 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/24 (2013.01); B02C 17/225 (2013.01); B24B 31/02 (2013.01); B24B 31/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714703 A1 19960605; EP 0714703 B1 20000209; AR 002457 A1 19980325; BR 9505598 A 19971104; CN 1071622 C 20010926; CN 1133220 A 19961016; DE 69514996 D1 20000316; DE 69514996 T2 20000608; ES 2143610 T3 20000516; JP 3616182 B2 20050202; JP H08206526 A 19960813; KR 100400439 B1 20031218; MX 9504956 A 19970131; SE 503673 C2 19960729; SE 9404159 D0 19941130; SE 9404159 L 19960531

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061113

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143610

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990713

1996-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960509

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL