Global Patent Index - EP 0714771 B1

EP 0714771 B1 2000-07-05 - Method and device for delivering a printing plate

Title (en)

Method and device for delivering a printing plate

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung einer Druckplatte

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la préparation d'une plaque d'impression

Publication

EP 0714771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118336 A

Priority

DE 4442574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714771A2] The printing plate prepn. device (28) is for one or more printing plates (11,40) for the fitment on a plate cylinder (1) of a rotary printing machine. A handling device (12) is used, and the prepn. device is provided with at least one suspension strip (34,39) for accommodation of printing plates, in which the suspended plates hang vertically in a prepn. position remote from the cylinder. The printing plate prepn. device together with the suspension strip are moved to a waiting position adjacent to the cylinder in which the suspended printing plates are located parallel to a transport plane (18) of the handling device. The prepn. device comprises two pivot arms (32) joined by at least one axially running suspension strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/1206 (2013.01); B41P 2227/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714771 A2 19960605; EP 0714771 A3 19970723; EP 0714771 B1 20000705; DE 4442574 A1 19960605; DE 4442574 C2 19961128; JP 2880441 B2 19990412; JP H08216370 A 19960827; US 5623877 A 19970429

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051122

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041122

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-11-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041122

2003-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508536 20000810

2000-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE