Global patent index - EP 0714989 B1

EP 0714989 B1 2000-03-22 - STEEL MANUFACTURING METHOD USING CONVERTER DEPHOSPHORISATION

Title (en)

STEEL MANUFACTURING METHOD USING CONVERTER DEPHOSPHORISATION

Title (de)

STAHLHERSTELLUNG IM KONVERTER MIT ENTPHOSPHORUNGSSTUFE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIER DEPHOSPHORE AU MOYEN D'UN CONVERTISSEUR

Publication

EP 0714989 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94919835 A

Priority

  • JP 9401070 W
  • JP 16256493 A
  • JP 16579093 A
  • JP 32908693 A
  • JP 32908893 A
  • JP 1102794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9501458A1] A method of efficiently carrying out the dephosphorization, dephosphorization-decarbonization, or desulfurization-dephosphorization-decarbonization of molten iron in a converter. The feed rates of flux and a bottom-blowing gas are regulated so that bottom-blowing agitation power of not less than 0.1 kW/t, a CaO/SiO2 of treated slag of 0.7-2.5, and a temperature at a treatment terminal point of 1200-1450 DEG C can be attained. A control operation is carried out so that the sum of the concentration of T.Fe and that of MnO in treated slag becomes 10-35 wt.%, by regulating a top blowing acid feed rate, a flow rate of a bottom blowing gas, or the height of a top blowing lance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/28; C21C 5/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/02 (2006.01); C21C 5/28 (2006.01); C21C 5/30 (2006.01); C21C 5/35 (2006.01); C21C 5/56 (2006.01); C21C 7/064 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/35 (2013.01); C21C 1/02 (2013.01); C21C 5/28 (2013.01); C21C 5/567 (2013.01); C21C 7/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9501458 A1 19950112; AU 680268 B2 19970724; AU 7083194 A 19950124; BR 9406985 A 19960305; CA 2166097 A1 19950112; CA 2166097 C 20020115; CN 1041843 C 19990127; CN 1128050 A 19960731; DE 69423630 D1 20000427; DE 69423630 T2 20001109; EP 0714989 A1 19960605; EP 0714989 A4 19970625; EP 0714989 B1 20000322; ES 2143547 T3 20000516; KR 0159180 B1 19990115

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-10-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060404

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143547

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423630

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980828

1997-06-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19970506

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960126

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT