Global Patent Index - EP 0714993 B1

EP 0714993 B1 2000-03-08 - Deep drawable and weldable AlMgSi type aluminium alloy

Title (en)

Deep drawable and weldable AlMgSi type aluminium alloy

Title (de)

Tiefziehbare und schweissbare Aluminiumlegierung vom Typ ALMgSi

Title (fr)

Alliage d'aluminium du type AlMgSi soudable et apte à l'emboutissage profond

Publication

EP 0714993 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810691 A

Priority

CH 360094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714993A1] AlMgSi-type Al alloy contains Mg and Si in amounts defined by ABCDE where: A = 0.5 Si;0.35 Mg B = 0.5 Si;0.6 Mg C = 0.95 Si;0.6 Mg D = 0.95 Si;0.4 Mg E = 0.8 Si;0.35 Mg. The alloy also contains 0.05-0.4 Cu; max. 0.15 Mn; max. 0.25 Fe plus other elements upto max. 0.05 per element and 0.15 in total; balance Al.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/02; C22C 21/08; C22F 1/043; C22F 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C22F 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 21/08 (2013.01); C22F 1/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714993 A1 19960605; EP 0714993 B1 20000308; CH 688379 A5 19970829; DE 59507951 D1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507951

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507951

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2013-08-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507951

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2008-09-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2008-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOVELIS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507951

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-10-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971126

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961205

1996-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI