Global Patent Index - EP 0715017 B1

EP 0715017 B1 2001-04-04 - An apparatus for winding of wire with variable hydrostatic transmission

Title (en)

An apparatus for winding of wire with variable hydrostatic transmission

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung für Draht mit einem regelbaren hydrostatischen Getriebe

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'enroulement de fil métallique avec transmission hydrostatique réglable

Publication

EP 0715017 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95610055 A

Priority

DK 130994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715017A1] The invention concerns an apparatus for twisting and winding a wire (1) onto a spool (6) and comprising at least one externally driven swing arm shaft to which outwardly directed arms (3, 10) are secured for guiding and twisting the wire (1). The apparatus moreover comprises a suspended cradle (20) which comprises a wire spool (6) onto which the wire (1) is wound by means of a traversing mechanism (5). The wire spool (6) is driven via a hydrostatic transmission arranged in the cradle (20) and comprising a hydraulic motor (17) and a pump (14) which are driven by the swing arm shaft. The hydrostatic transmission of the apparatus is adapted to perform variable displacement of the hydrostatic medium. This ensures that the displacement of the hydrostatic medium can be regulated, thereby avoiding unnecessary generation of heat and providing controlled tension of the wire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 3/10 (2013.01); D07B 2207/409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715017 A1 19960605; EP 0715017 B1 20010404; DK 130994 A 19960517; DK 173379 B1 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20141124

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20141124

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121116

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971209

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961121

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT