Global patent index - EP 0715020 B1

EP 0715020 B1 2000-07-26 - Use of a coating agent for paper surfaces

Title (en)

Use of a coating agent for paper surfaces

Title (de)

Verwendung eines Beschichtungsmittels für Papieroberflächen

Title (fr)

Usage d'un agent de revêtement pour des surfaces de papier

Publication

EP 0715020 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118737 A

Priority

DE 9419333 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2164154A1] The present invention relates to a coating agent for paper surfaces, in particular for paper which is aluminized. The coating agent comprises an aqueous polymer dispersion which comprises dispersed in aqueous phase a mixture of polymer particles having an average particle size of 0.2 to 5.mu.m and particles having an average particle size of smaller than 0.1 .mu.m. The mixing ratio of coarser polymer particles to the finer particles preferably amounts to 1 : 1 to 9 : 1. The coating agent according to the present invention is suitable not only to prepare an evaporation coating with metal, such as aluminum, but also as a primer layer which is applied after application of the metal layer, for example, to render the paper printable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/08; D21H 19/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/08 (2006.01); D21H 19/20 (2006.01); D21H 19/40 (2006.01); D21H 19/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/20 (2013.01); D21H 19/08 (2013.01); D21H 19/40 (2013.01); D21H 19/58 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9419333 U1 19950126; AT 195010 T 20000815; CA 2164154 A1 19960603; EP 0715020 A1 19960605; EP 0715020 B1 20000726; FI 955796 A0 19951201; FI 955796 A 19960603

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2003-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031105

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19951229

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195010

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A COATING AGENT FOR PAPER SURFACES

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A COATING AGENT FOR PAPER SURFACES

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980811

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961205

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL SE

1996-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 951229

1996-06-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 951229