Global Patent Index - EP 0715026 B1

EP 0715026 B1 2000-03-08 - Movable barrier element, barrier formed therewith and method for forming such barrier

Title (en)

Movable barrier element, barrier formed therewith and method for forming such barrier

Title (de)

Versetzbahres Fahrbahnbegrenzungselement, Fahrbahnbegrenzung damit hergestellt und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément séparateur transposable, séparateur ainsi formé et méthode

Publication

EP 0715026 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203303 A

Priority

NL 9402022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715026A1] The invention relates to a movable barrier element (1), comprising a beam-shaped body provided on at least one outer end with connecting means (14,15) which are adapted to absorb kinetic energy, for instance when the body is rotated on at least one of its axes. For this purpose the connecting means comprise at least one deforming member manufactured from an elastic material (14,15), the stiffness of which is less than that of the beam-shaped body. The body further has a sloping end face (9,10) on its outer end and the deforming member is arranged on the sloping end face. The invention also relates to a movable barrier formed from a plurality of such barrier elements, which are mutually connected. Finally, the invention relates to a method for forming a movable barrier by placing a plurality of movable barrier elements one after another in lengthwise direction and mutually joining the elements by means of connecting means placed therebetween, wherein the connecting means are placed under bias. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/088 (2013.01); E01F 15/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715026 A1 19960605; EP 0715026 B1 20000308; DE 69515426 D1 20000413; DE 69515426 T2 20001123; NL 193170 B 19980901; NL 193170 C 19990105; NL 9402022 A 19960701

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-02 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515426

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130402

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515426 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980416

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961030

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL