Global Patent Index - EP 0715039 B1

EP 0715039 B1 2000-05-03 - Shuttering element

Title (en)

Shuttering element

Title (de)

Schalungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de coffrage

Publication

EP 0715039 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117597 A

Priority

DE 4442639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715039A1] The framework has a support (3) for erecting a shuttering wall (2), and which is connected to it. The framework is left behind in a finished reinforced concrete component. The support acts as a separator for the reinforcement (10), and is formed from spaced bars (4,5). The wall may be fixed to the support so that it projects above its upper edge (6). The wall may also project beyond the plane (7) on which the support stands. At least one bar (5) of the structure of the support, may be in the region of its upper edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715039 A1 19960605; EP 0715039 B1 20000503; AT 192530 T 20000515; DE 4442639 A1 19960613; ES 2147814 T3 20001001; PT 715039 E 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 192530 T

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508263

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001108

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-11-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-09-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FISCHER WILLIBALD

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-11-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147814 T3

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508263 20000608

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192530 T 20000515

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981229

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961203

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE