Global Patent Index - EP 0715064 B1

EP 0715064 B1 2000-03-22 - Exhaust system

Title (en)

Exhaust system

Title (de)

Auspuffsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'échappement

Publication

EP 0715064 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118038 A

Priority

DE 4442573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715064A1] The flange connection is used between at least one engine exhaust pipe (9) and a further component and has a sealing plate (2) with an opening (7) for the exhaust pipe and an overlying sheet metal part (1). The latter is provided with a corresponding opening (3) having a deep drawn peripheral lip (8), which fits into the end of the exhaust pipe. A connection (5) for a lambda probe is coupled to at least one of the openings in the sealing plate or the sheet metal part. Pref. sheet the metal part and the sealing plate are spaced from one another at the connection for the lambda probe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/08; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/00 (2010.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1805 (2013.01); F01N 13/00 (2013.01); F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 13/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/1439 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715064 A1 19960605; EP 0715064 B1 20000322; AT 191062 T 20000415; DE 4442573 A1 19960605

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-01-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ERHARDT BISCHOFF G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508046 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191062 T 20000415

1999-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: EXHAUST SYSTEM

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980904

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961110

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE