Global Patent Index - EP 0715084 B1

EP 0715084 B1 2000-05-17 - A conical rotary actuator and its application to control an aircraft hinge

Title (en)

A conical rotary actuator and its application to control an aircraft hinge

Title (de)

Konischer Drehflügelantrieb und seine Verwendung zur Steuerung eines Scharniers eines Flugzeuges

Title (fr)

Vérin rotatif conique et son application à la commande d'une gouverne d'aéronef

Publication

EP 0715084 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402648 A

Priority

  • FR 9414222 A
  • US 56276195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715084A1] The cylinder consists of coaxially inner (32) and outer (34) housings enclosing at least one annular space containing two sets of vanes (40,44) one fixed to each housing and located alternately inside the space(s) to form variable-volume control chambers. At least one of the two housings has a variable cross-section, so that the vanes' width decreases from one end to the other. The other housing has a constant cross-section, while the inner one has truncated conical and cylindrical sections (38a,38b), meeting at the smaller end of the truncated conical section. The inner and outer housings form, respectively, a rotor and stator, with the inner housing linked to a heating fluid circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/12; B64C 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 13/40 (2006.01); F15B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/12 (2013.01); B64C 13/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715084 A1 19960605; EP 0715084 B1 20000517; FR 2727477 A1 19960531; FR 2727477 B1 19970214; US 5722616 A 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111124

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-09-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69516987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111123

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AEROSPATIALE MATRA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990811

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961112

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE