Global patent index - EP 0715120 B1

EP 0715120 B1 2000-04-05 - Motor vehicle headlamp of elliptical type comprising a pivotable shutter

Title (en)

Motor vehicle headlamp of elliptical type comprising a pivotable shutter

Title (de)

Kfz-Projektionsscheinwerfer mit einer schwenkbaren Blende

Title (fr)

Projecteur de type elliptique pour véhicule automobile, comportant un cache basculant

Publication

EP 0715120 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402693 A

Priority

FR 9414370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715120A1] The headlamp is designed to give a suitably directed dipped beam for driving on either side of the road, by means of the mask (3) which consists of an L-shaped screen having two wings (31,32) each formed of three straight segments and pivotable about a horizontal transverse axis (XX'). To convert from the right-hand running position to the left-hand, a bent wire (5) is pulled (h) causing the assembly to rotate (g) until the initially vertical wing (31) attains one horizontal stop (41), while the other wing (32) moves from the other horizontal stop (41') into the vertical position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 10/00; F21V 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1778 (2013.01); F21S 48/171 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715120 A1 19960605; EP 0715120 B1 20000405; DE 69516093 D1 20000511; DE 69516093 T2 20000914; ES 2146725 T3 20000816; FR 2727495 A1 19960531; FR 2727495 B1 19970214

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061129

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146725

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 10/00 A, 7F 21V 11/00 B

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990514

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961202

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT