Global patent index - EP 0715122 B1

EP 0715122 B1 2000-01-19 - Exhaust gas treatment apparatus for use in incineration equipment

Title (en)

Exhaust gas treatment apparatus for use in incineration equipment

Title (de)

Abgasbehandlungsvorrichtung für Abfallverbrennungsanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement des gaz de fumée pour une installation d'incinération

Publication

EP 0715122 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95850190 A

Priority

  • JP 29543794 A
  • JP 4769295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715122A2] An exhaust gas treatment apparatus for use in an incineration equipment is provided which comprises: a temperature adjuster (11) for cooling exhaust gas discharged from an incinerator (2) ; a bag filter (12) for removing dust from the exhaust gas cooled by the temperature adjuster (11) ; and a denitrator (14) for catalytically denitrating the exhaust gas supplied from the dust collector, the temperature adjuster (11) having a first heat exchanger (21) for cooling the exhaust gas of a high temperature discharged from the incinerator (2) with air and a second heat exchanger (22) for heating the exhaust gas of a lower temperature supplied from the bag filter (12) with the high-temperature exhaust gas discharged from the incinerator (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 15/02; F23J 15/06; F23J 15/08; F28F 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/46 (2006.01); F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23J 15/00 (2006.01); F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F28F 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/04 (2013.01); F23J 15/006 (2013.01); F23J 2215/10 (2013.01); F23J 2217/101 (2013.01); F23J 2219/10 (2013.01); F23J 2900/15081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715122 A2 19960605; EP 0715122 A3 19970212; EP 0715122 B1 20000119; AT 189050 T 20000215; CN 1084460 C 20020508; CN 1132331 A 19961002; DE 69514628 D1 20000224; DE 69514628 T2 20000810; DK 0715122 T3 20000613; JP 3051040 B2 20000612; JP H08210617 A 19960820; KR 100188311 B1 19990601; TW 285709 B 19960911

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051102

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-14 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2002-12-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021103

2002-11-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-11-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-11-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-11-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011114

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-11-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011106

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-10-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011029

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514628

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189050

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980304

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970812

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT NL SE