Global Patent Index - EP 0715316 B1

EP 0715316 B1 2000-05-31 - Continuous protecting sheath for coating an electric cable bundle

Title (en)

Continuous protecting sheath for coating an electric cable bundle

Title (de)

Kontinuierliche Schutzumhüllung zum Beschichten von einem elektrischen Kabelbaum

Title (fr)

Gaine protectrice continue pour revêtir un faisceau de câbles électriques

Publication

EP 0715316 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95830494 A

Priority

IT MI940798 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715316A2] The present invention relates to a continuous protecting sheath for coating an electric cable bundle, which comprises a foamed coating including an electric cable bundle. The main feature of the invention is that on the outer surface of the coating are formed projecting portions adapted to protect the individual cables of the cable bundle which individual cables can be exposed at or project from the surface of the coating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/184 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715316 A2 19960605; EP 0715316 A3 19970312; EP 0715316 B1 20000531; DE 69517288 D1 20000706; DE 69517288 T2 20001102; IT 234264 Y1 20000309; IT MI940798 U1 19960603; IT MI940798 V0 19941201

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071127

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061127

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061127

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517288 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. FRANCO CICOGNA

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980312

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT