Global Patent Index - EP 0715509 B8

EP 0715509 B8 2002-09-18 - ACCOMMODATING INTRAOCULAR LENS

Title (en)

ACCOMMODATING INTRAOCULAR LENS

Title (de)

AKKOMODIERENDE INTRAOKULARE LINSE

Title (fr)

LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE PERMETTANT L'ACCOMMODATION

Publication

EP 0715509 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 94927244 A

Priority

  • US 9409654 W
  • US 11321593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9506446A2] An accommodating intraocular lens (32) to be implanted within the natural capsular bag (20) of a human eye (10) from which the natural lens matrix has been removed through an anterior capsule opening in the bag circumferentially surrounded by an anterior capsular remnant (22). During a postoperative healing period following surgery, the anterior capsular remnant fuses to the posterior capsule of the bag by fibrosis (42) about haptics (36) on the implanted lens while the ciliary muscle (28) is maintained in its relaxed state by a cycloplegic to prevent dislocation of the lens, and the lens is deflected rearwardly by the fibrosing anterior capsular remnant (22) to a distant vision position against the elastic posterior capsule (24) of the bag in which the posterior capsule is stretched rearwardly. After fibrosis is complete, natural brain-induced contraction and relaxation of the ciliary muscle (28) relaxes and stretches the fibrosed anterior remnant and increases and reduces vitreous pressure in the eye to effect vision accommodation by the remnant, the posterior capsule, and vitreous pressure. A method of utilizing the intraocular lens to provide a patient with vision accommodation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29D 11/026 (2013.01); A61F 2/1629 (2013.01); A61F 2/15 (2015.04); A61F 2002/1681 (2013.01); A61F 2002/1689 (2013.01); A61F 2220/0091 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9506446 A2 19950309; WO 9506446 A3 19950420; AT 214255 T 20020315; AT 269040 T 20040715; AT 411785 T 20081115; AT 454107 T 20100115; CA 2169083 A1 19950309; DE 69430125 D1 20020418; DE 69430125 T2 20020814; DE 69433855 D1 20040722; DE 69433855 T2 20050407; DE 69433855 T3 20090709; DE 69435153 D1 20081204; DE 69435264 D1 20100225; DE 9422429 U1 20020124; EP 0715509 A1 19960612; EP 0715509 A4 19970820; EP 0715509 B1 20020313; EP 0715509 B2 20110713; EP 0715509 B8 20020918; EP 1186276 A1 20020313; EP 1186276 B1 20040616; EP 1186276 B2 20080709; EP 1457171 A2 20040915; EP 1457171 A3 20050518; EP 1457171 B1 20081022; EP 1637094 A2 20060322; EP 1637094 A3 20060329; EP 1637094 B1 20100106; JP 3677040 B2 20050727; JP H09501856 A 19970225

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140823

2014-09-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140823

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111014

2011-10-14 [REG DE R135] EUROPEAN PATENT DEEMED VOID AB INITIO FOR DE

- Document: DE 69430125

2011-09-01 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69430125

- Effective date: 20110713

2011-07-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20110713

2011-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2011-07-13 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69430125

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070824

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-08-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060802

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUMANOPTICS AG

- Effective date: 20021022

2003-02-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAPPERS, RUDOLF, DIPL.-ING.

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUMANOPTICS AG

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: CUMMING, J.STUART

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69430125 20020418

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214255 T 20020315

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDEVEC LICENSING B.V.

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDEVEC LICENSING B.V.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1997-08-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960318

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI