Global Patent Index - EP 0715821 A3

EP 0715821 A3 2001-12-05 - Liquid or pasty product dispenser with an applicator head

Title (en)

Liquid or pasty product dispenser with an applicator head

Title (de)

Spender für einen flüssigen oder partösen Produkt mit einem Auftragsteil

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour un produit de consistance liquide à pâteuse équipé d'un embout d'application

Publication

EP 0715821 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 95402560 A

Priority

  • FR 9414653 A
  • FR 9414652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0715821A2] The applicator, e.g. for a lip balm or other cosmetic skin product, consists of a tubular reservoir (2) for the product, communicating with an outlet (61), and having a lengthwise slit (21) and a piston (4) at the opposite end to the outlet, and a base (9) with a drive for the piston. The reservoir and base are made in one piece, with the slit covering only part of the reservoir's length, while the upper end of the reservoir is equipped with an applicator tip (6) contg. the outlet (61). The piston drive comprises a ring (5) surrounding the reservoir and having an inner spiral drive surface which engages with a projection (43) on the piston through the slit. The applicator tip is made from an elastomer material selected from polyethylene, polyurethane, polyester, polyether block amides, polyvinyls, ethylene ter-polymers, propylene and diene, styrene butadiene polymers, silicones, nitrile rubbers and latex.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; A45D 40/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/26 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/04 (2006.01); B05B 1/02 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05C 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 47/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/262 (2013.01); A45D 34/042 (2013.01); A45D 40/04 (2013.01); A45D 2200/055 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0715821 A2 19960612; EP 0715821 A3 20011205; EP 0715821 B1 20040519; CA 2164471 A1 19960607; CA 2164471 C 20020219; DE 69533055 D1 20040624; DE 69533055 T2 20050512; ES 2220921 T3 20041216; JP 2885676 B2 19990426; JP H08229462 A 19960910; US 5879095 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081117

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081115

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220921 T3

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69533055 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT