Global Patent Index - EP 0715896 B1

EP 0715896 B1 2001-04-04 - A rotary atomiser with a rotating bell

Title (en)

A rotary atomiser with a rotating bell

Title (de)

Rotationszerstäuber mit einem Glockenkörper

Title (fr)

Atomatiseur rotatif à cloche

Publication

EP 0715896 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119236 A

Priority

DE 9419641 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2164564A1] A rotary atomizer with a bell element (1) mountable on the rotating shaft of a drive motor comprises an outer overflow surface (2), a spray edge (3) at a front side of the bell element (1), a lateral outer surface (5) at the perimeter of the bell element extending from the spray edge (3), and a hose line (9) in fluid communication with a source of cleaning fluid. Rinsing the outer surface (5) at the perimeter of the bell element (1) of a rotary atomizer is facilitated. The rinsing agent is directed without spattering, through centrifugal force, from the interior to the outer surface (5) and is distributed uniformly across the perimeter. The rinsing agent can branch off centrally from a fast-rinsing valve and move to a collection space (29, 15) located radially within the outer surface (5), from where it flows via the rear, preferably rounded bell dome edge (6). Alternatively, the rinsing agent can be supplied separately via a separate valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/10; B05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/10 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1042 (2013.01); B05B 3/1014 (2013.01); B05B 3/1064 (2013.01); B05B 15/025 (2013.01); B05B 3/1092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9419641 U1 19950202; AU 4022995 A 19960613; BR 9505688 A 19971111; CA 2164564 A1 19960608; CA 2164564 C 20100316; CZ 286837 B6 20000712; CZ 9503082 A3 19970917; EP 0715896 A2 19960612; EP 0715896 A3 19970423; EP 0715896 B1 20010404; ES 2088776 T1 19960916; ES 2088776 T3 20010816; JP 3940445 B2 20070704; JP H08332415 A 19961217; KR 100384649 B1 20030821; MX 9505093 A 19981031; US 5707009 A 19980113

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151205

2015-12-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151205

2015-12-09 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151205

2015-12-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59509156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2088776

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990720

1997-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970429

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1996-09-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2088776

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1996-08-02 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1996-08-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

1996-07-31 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

1996-07-02 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2088776

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE