Global patent index - EP 0716017 B1

EP 0716017 B1 2000-03-22 - Machine for covering bottles with a protecting coating

Title (en)

Machine for covering bottles with a protecting coating

Title (de)

Maschine zum Umhüllen von Flaschen mit einer Schutzbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Machine pour gainer des bouteilles avec un revêtement protecteur.

Publication

EP 0716017 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402839 A

Priority

EP 94402839 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716017A1] The applicator, designed to give bottles a protective sleeve to prevent damage in transit and storage, consists of a series of supports (4) on a rotary unit with a feed and an outlet. Each support comprises a cylindrical block (16) with inner ducts (19) linked to a vacuum source which enables it to pick up a strip of material by section and apply it to a bottle. Each cylindrical block is mounted on a fixed axle (15), about which it can rotate, and has a base in the form of a Geneva mechanism (23, 25, 27) which rotates it through given angles. The blocks are also interchangeable, depending on the dimensions of the bottles being sleeves. During operation the sleeves are taken one at a time from a stack and applied to the bottles as they rotate, being stuck in place by an adhesive edge on each sleeve, which is made preferably from corrugated cardboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/00; B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716017 A1 19960612; EP 0716017 B1 20000322; DE 69423632 D1 20000427

INPADOC legal status

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1997-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971006

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961125

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL