Global Patent Index - EP 0716040 B1

EP 0716040 B1 2000-04-12 - Free stroke damping

Title (en)

Free stroke damping

Title (de)

Dämpfung der freien Bewegung

Title (fr)

Amortissement de la course libre

Publication

EP 0716040 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95850205 A

Priority

SE 9404118 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716040A1] Device for the reduction of shocks in the lifting movement at a lifting truck of the kind that includes a lifting fork carriage (5) moveable vertically in a mast part (4) that in turn is movable and where the fork carriage in the mast part is lifted by means of a hydraulic cylinder (7) fastened in the upper end of the mast part. Its piston rod (9) is extendable downwards and over a pulley (8) in the lower end of the piston rod a chain (6) runs that from an upper fastening point in the mast part (4) runs down around the pulley (8) and up again over another pulley (15) fastened in the upper end of the mast part and then once again downwards to be fastened in the fork carriage (5). The hydraulic cylinders of the fork carriage and the mast parts are coupled in parallel but have such relative cross sections that the cylinder (7) of the fork carriage have smaller pressure requirement than the mast cylinders. In the frame of the truck or in a mast part (2) fastened to the truck frame a sensor (11) is arranged close to the lower end position of the piston rod (8) and for cooperating with this in such a way that when the piston rod (8) approaches its lower end position , that is the lifting carriage is approaching its upper end position in the mast part, the sensor is triggered. The sensor is coupled to the hydraulic means that feed hydraulic oil to the hydraulic cylinder reducing the oil flow so that the speed of the carriage is reduced close to the end of the travel of the carriage in the frame part (4) and at lowering the mast movement speed is reduced in the vicinity of the lower end position of the mast parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/08; B66F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/08 (2006.01); B66F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2013.01); B66F 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716040 A1 19960612; EP 0716040 B1 20000412; DE 69516250 D1 20000518; DE 69516250 T2 20000810; SE 505606 C2 19970922; SE 9404118 D0 19941128; SE 9404118 L 19960529

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141124

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141124

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516250

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516250 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980929

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960923

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE