Global Patent Index - EP 0716154 B1

EP 0716154 B1 2000-01-19 - Use of an aluminium und titanium alloy and a coating material for such a use

Title (en)

Use of an aluminium und titanium alloy and a coating material for such a use

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Legierung aus Aluminium und Titan und Beschichtungswerkstoff für eine solche Verwendung

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un alliage en aluminium et titane et matériau de revêtemens pour telle utilisation

Publication

EP 0716154 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118740 A

Priority

DE 4443147 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716154A2] An Al-Ti alloy contains 22-56 atm.% Al.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716154 A2 19960612; EP 0716154 A3 19961016; EP 0716154 B1 20000119; DE 4443147 A1 19960627; JP H08218138 A 19960827

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091129

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-04-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DECHEMA GESELLSCHAFT FUER CHEMISCHE TECHNIK UND BI

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507645 20000224

2000-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970410

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1996-09-18 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 14/00

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE