Global Patent Index - EP 0716169 B1

EP 0716169 B1 2000-05-31 - Textile machine for producing crosswound bobbins

Title (en)

Textile machine for producing crosswound bobbins

Title (de)

Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0716169 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113894 A

Priority

DE 4443818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716169A2] A textile machine producing cross-wound packages, esp. an open-end spinning machine, is equipped with a travelling piecer which uses an auxiliary yarn supplied through a pneumatic delivery pipe (37). The yarn is placed on the empty yarn tube by a placing device (51) which is mounted on the delivery pipe support (53). The placing device (51) has a yarn retainer (66) and a hinged yarn guide plate (54) with a guide contour (70), guide groove (81) and transfer slot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/48; D01H 4/50; D01H 15/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/48 (2006.01); B65H 54/34 (2006.01); D01H 4/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/50 (2013.01); B65H 54/343 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716169 A2 19960612; EP 0716169 A3 19961106; EP 0716169 B1 20000531; DE 4443818 A1 19960613; DE 4443818 B4 20050818; JP H08209466 A 19960813; US 5634602 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2001-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508420

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981113

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970506

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI