Global patent index - EP 0716171 B1

EP 0716171 B1 2000-02-09 - Weft tensioning and detecting device for jet looms

Title (en)

Weft tensioning and detecting device for jet looms

Title (de)

Schussfadenstreck- und Detektiereinrichtung für Düsenwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tension et de détection de la trame pour métiers à tisser à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0716171 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118267 A

Priority

DE 4443371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4443371C1] The jet loom has a weft tensioner and break detector in which weft yarn enters a passage (11) in the direction of the arrow (A). An air stream crosses the yarn passage (11), pref. at right angles, guided by ducts (14,15) and is connected to a second yarn passage (18). Each yarn passage (11,18) has a yarn detector (19,20). The length of the yarn passages (11,18) can be varied and the yarn detectors can be moved along the support body (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30; D03D 51/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/00 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/308 (2013.01); D03D 47/3073 (2013.01); D03D 51/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443371 C1 19960118; EP 0716171 A2 19960612; EP 0716171 A3 19960731; EP 0716171 B1 20000209; JP 2758579 B2 19980528; JP H08209499 A 19960813; US 5606998 A 19970304

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDAUER DORNIER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507778

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970619

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961113

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI