Global Patent Index - EP 0716185 B1

EP 0716185 B1 2001-02-28 - Method of producing a frog point as well as frog point

Title (en)

Method of producing a frog point as well as frog point

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Herzstückspitze sowie Herzstückspitze

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la réalisation d'une pointe du coeur ainsi qu'une pointe du coeur

Publication

EP 0716185 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118492 A

Priority

DE 4442415 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716185A1] Points for a rail system are made by welding together a head section (12) and rail sections (14, 16) which are made from different types of steel. After welding, the welded unit is heat treated to produce the required crystal structures in the different sections. The shape of the different sections is such that they fit tightly into each other before welding. The rail sections are made of rail steel containing (in wt.%): 0.73-0.79 C, 0.86-0.99 Mn, 0.21-0.32 Si, 0.07-0.025 P, 0.008-0.022 S, 0.02-0.14 Cr and 0.000 Nb (sic) plus usual melting impurities. The head section is made of a special steel contg. 0.53-0.62 C, 0.15-0.25 Si, 0.65-1.1 Mn, 0.8-1.3 Cr, 0.05-0.11 Mo, 0.05-0.11 V, max. 0.02 P, max. 0.025 Al, 0.5 Nb, balance Fe and usual impurities. The ratio of Mn to Cr is min. 0.8 Mn:max. 0.85 Cr and that of Mo to V is approx. 1. After heat treating, the head section is martensitic and the rail sections pearlitic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/04 (2006.01); E01B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/04 (2013.01); E01B 7/10 (2013.01); C21D 2251/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4442415 A1 19960530; AT 199417 T 20010315; DK 0716185 T3 20010618; EP 0716185 A1 19960612; EP 0716185 B1 20010228; ES 2155867 T3 20010601; GR 3035868 T3 20010831; PT 716185 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509058

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2009-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080605

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-06-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. *BWG

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-12-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-14 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2001-06-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155867 T3

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-04-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509058 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199417 T 20010315

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990226

1999-02-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWG BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. K

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961212

1996-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

1996-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;SI

1996-06-12 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT;SI