Global Patent Index - EP 0716194 B1

EP 0716194 B1 2002-11-27 - Profile in which the hollow part is filled with a heat retaining material

Title (en)

Profile in which the hollow part is filled with a heat retaining material

Title (de)

Profil mit Profilhohlkammer gefüllt mit einem wärmebindenden Material

Title (fr)

Profilé dont la partie creuse comprend comme élément de remplissage un matériau retenant la chaleur

Publication

EP 0716194 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118355 A

Priority

DE 4443761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716194A2] The component is made from alum as the hydrophilic absorbent material and gypsum. Potassium alum can be used bonded in a gypsum matrix. The component can be made from 50% potassium alum and 50% modified gypsum. The component is designed as a plate and several plates are connected into a frame covering a corresponding frame of metal, wood or plastics. The components can be shaped bodies or profiled strands and used as fillers for profiled hollow chambers or as covers for inner and outer constructions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/94; A62C 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2006.01); E04B 2/96 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/161 (2013.01); E04B 1/944 (2013.01); E04B 2/967 (2013.01); E06B 5/165 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7078 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716194 A2 19960612; EP 0716194 A3 19970514; EP 0716194 B1 20021127; AT 228600 T 20021215; DE 4443761 A1 19960613

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510473 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228600 T 20021215

2002-01-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROFILE IN WHICH THE HOLLOW PART IS FILLED WITH A HEAT RETAINING MATERIAL

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL