Global patent index - EP 0716208 B1

EP 0716208 B1 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for filling the edge joint of insulating glass panes with a sealing substance

Title (en)

Apparatus for filling the edge joint of insulating glass panes with a sealing substance

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Füllen der Randfuge von Isolierglasscheiben mit einer Versiegelungsmasse

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour remplir le joint de bord avec une masse de scellement d'un vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 0716208 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116382 A

Priority

DE 9416684 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716208A2] The glass panels are moved standing on edge on a horizontal conveyor (1,2) past the nozzles (10,11) supplying the sealing mass. The rotatable nozzle (10) rotates infinitely during its up and down movement and can be fixed at any angular position. The rotatable nozzle can be brought into the work position of the other nozzle (11). The horizontal conveyor has a reversible drive. Only the metering device belonging to the rotatable nozzle has a regulator which regulates the amount of sealing mass emerging in dependence on the relative speed between nozzle and glass pane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67343 (2013.01); E06B 2003/67378 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9416684 U1 19950126; AT 192544 T 20000515; EP 0716208 A2 19960612; EP 0716208 A3 19970212; EP 0716208 B1 20000503

INPADOC legal status

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-08-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060804

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060804

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GLASTECHNISCHE INDUSTRIE PETER LISEC GESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508266

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192544

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980511

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970811

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE