Global Patent Index - EP 0716262 B1

EP 0716262 B1 2001-01-17 - Lighting fixture for linear lighting means

Title (en)

Lighting fixture for linear lighting means

Title (de)

Leuchte für langgestreckte Leuchtmittel

Title (fr)

Armature d'éclairage pour sources lumineuses linéaires

Publication

EP 0716262 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116878 A

Priority

DE 4443741 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716262A1] The light-fitting has a flat dished housing (1) with a curved rear reflector (5,6) enclosing the tubular fluorescent lamps (8), which are associated with a light shield (14) provided by a number of relative spaced raster surfaces (9) of a transparent material, positioned on both sides of the fluorescent lamps. The raster surfaces extend parallel to one another and are coupled together via perpendicular bridging sections (10) of a transparent material. The length of the raster surfaces is pref. varied in steps with the longest surfaces lying closest to the fluorescent lamps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/02; F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 13/10 (2006.01); F21Y 103/00 (2006.01); F21Y 103/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 11/02 (2013.01); F21V 5/002 (2013.01); F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2113/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716262 A1 19960612; EP 0716262 B1 20010117; AT 198786 T 20010215; CA 2150447 A1 19960609; DE 4443741 A1 19960613; DK 0716262 T3 20010205; ES 2153451 T3 20010301; US 5685633 A 19971111

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030707

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ENGEL HARTMUT S.

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-10-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-10-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153451 T3

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508976 20010222

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198786 T 20010215

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/02 A, 7F 21V 7/09 B

2001-01-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981124

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961211

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE