Global patent index - EP 0716272 B1

EP 0716272 B1 2000-01-19 - Low-noise fume extracting hood

Title (en)

Low-noise fume extracting hood

Title (de)

Geräuschreduzierte Dunstabzugshaube

Title (fr)

Hotte d'évacuation de fumées à bruit réduit

Publication

EP 0716272 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118837 A

Priority

DE 4443176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716272A2] The hood has a casing with filter, induction aperture and output aperture partly covered with soundproofing material, and a fan in the casing. Sound-proof material (20, 21) is fitted in the casing, at least opposite each input aperture (32, 33) of the fan (30) in the casing (10). The sound-proof material is spaced away from the opposite input aperture by at least half the radius of the fanwheel (37). The sound-proof material opposite a single input aperture has a surface of at least as large as that of a disc of the same radius as the fanwheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01); Y10S 454/906 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443176 C1 19960502; EP 0716272 A2 19960612; EP 0716272 A3 19970326; EP 0716272 B1 20000119; US 5720274 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151129

2015-12-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151129

2015-11-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59507646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59507646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-03-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2001-01-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980330

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970613

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL