Global Patent Index - EP 0716280 B1

EP 0716280 B1 2001-05-16 - Method and apparatus for the low temperature air separation

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the low temperature air separation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de séparation d'air à basse température

Publication

EP 0716280 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118951 A

Priority

DE 4443190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716280A2] Process for low temp. decomposition of air comprises cooling a 1st partial stream (101) of compressed and purified air (1), passing to a main rectification system (4) and decomposing into liq. O2 and gaseous N2. In a 1st condenser-evaporator (2), a liq. fraction (20, 29) is vaporised in indirect heat exchange with a 2nd stream (202, 203) of compressed and purified air. The 2nd partial stream is partially condensed in this exchange and an argon-contg. oxygen fraction (22) from the rectification system (4) is fed to a raw argon column (24) where it is sepd. into raw argon and an oxygen rich liq.. Vaporous raw argon from the head of the column (24) is liquefied by indirect heat exchange with at least part of the 2nd stream (203) downstream of the 1st condenser-evaporator in a 2nd condenser-evaporator (27), where at least a part of the 2nd stream evaporates. Virtually the entire cold required for the liquefaction of raw argon is produced by the evapn. of the second stream. Also claimed is a process as above where at least a part of the 2nd partial stream (205) evaporated in the 2nd condenser-evaporator is fed to the rectification system without further pressure increase. Also claimed are devices to carry out the above processes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 23/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04103 (2013.01); F25J 3/04084 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04672 (2013.01); F25J 2245/40 (2013.01); Y10S 62/924 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716280 A2 19960612; EP 0716280 A3 19970416; EP 0716280 B1 20010516; CN 1125838 A 19960703; DE 4443190 A1 19960613; JP H08233458 A 19960913; TW 299244 B 19970301; US 5644934 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509262 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE LOW TEMPERATURE AIR SEPARATION

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990526

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970612

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT