Global Patent Index - EP 0716432 B1

EP 0716432 B1 2000-02-23 - Planar inductor

Title (en)

Planar inductor

Title (de)

Planare Induktivität

Title (fr)

Inductivité plane

Publication

EP 0716432 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95203290 A

Priority

DE 4442994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716432A1] The inductance has at least one essentially spiral shaped coil (2, 3) formed on a flat substrate (1). A layer of ferromagnetic material (13) is arranged on the substrate (1). The ferromagnetic material (13) is applied to the substrate (1) in a coating process, within an insulation window (12) fastened to the substrate (1). The window (12) is preferably fastened to the substrate (1) by adhesive. The ferromagnetic material may be a coating material mixed with a ferromagnetic admixture, eg. ferrite powder. The value of the induction of the coil(s) (2,3) and/or the coupling between the coils (2, 3) may be determined by the alignment and/or the contour of the insulation window (12) and/or by the layer depth and/or combination of the ferromagnetic material (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00; H01F 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 21/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/046 (2013.01); H01F 17/0006 (2013.01); H01F 21/06 (2013.01); H01F 2017/0046 (2013.01); H01F 2017/0086 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 4442994 A1 19960605; EP 0716432 A1 19960612; EP 0716432 B1 20000223; JP 3548643 B2 20040728; JP H08222437 A 19960830; US 2004004525 A1 20040108; US 6600403 B1 20030729; US 6722017 B2 20040420

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101129

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507840

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101129

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-12-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-11-22 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-10-09 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507840 20000330

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990203

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG GMBH

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961212

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB