Global Patent Index - EP 0716596 B8

EP 0716596 B8 2007-10-03 - NEW PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TOPICAL USE CONTAINING HYALURONIC ACID AND ITS DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

NEW PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TOPICAL USE CONTAINING HYALURONIC ACID AND ITS DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

HYALURONSÄURE UND DEREN DERIVATE ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR TOPISCHEN ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A USAGE TOPIQUE RENFERMANT DE L'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE ET SES DERIVES

Publication

EP 0716596 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 94925418 A

Priority

  • EP 9402536 W
  • IT PD930165 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9503786A2] Provided is a pharmaceutical composition, comprising a pharmaceutically effective amount of an acidic polysaccharide and/or a derivative thereof, a gaseous vehicle, and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier or excipient. Said acidic polysaccharide or derivative thereof can be hyaluronic acid, a pharmaceutically acceptable salt of hyaluronic acid, a partial or total ester of hyaluronic acid with an alcohol, a partial or total intermolecular ester of hyaluronic acid, a partial or total intramolecular ester of hyaluronic acid, a cross-linked ester of hyaluronic acid, an alginic acid ester, an ester of carboxymethylcellulose, an ester of carboxymethylchitin, an ester of carboxymethyl starch, a gellan ester, a cross-linked gellan ester, a pectic acid ester, and a pectinic acid ester. The composition can contain one or more topical drugs, and can be in the form of an aerosol or liquid spray, a foam, or a dry spray. The composition is useful in the treatment of a variety of pathological situations requiring the acceleration of tissue repair, for example in the treatment of burns, sores, ulcerations, and wounds. Also provided is a therapeutic method, comprising topically administering a pharmaceutical composition comprising a pharmaceutically effective amount of an acidic polysaccharide and/or a derivative thereof in association with a gaseous vehicle and a pharmacologically acceptable excipient, and optionally, one or more topical drugs.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/715 (2006.01); A61K 31/728 (2006.01); A61L 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 26/0076 (2013.01); A61K 9/12 (2013.01); A61K 9/122 (2013.01); A61K 31/715 (2013.01); A61L 26/0023 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61L 26/0023 + C08L 5/08

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9503786 A2 19950209; WO 9503786 A3 19950316; AT 365033 T 20070715; AU 7534194 A 19950228; DE 69434992 D1 20070802; DE 69434992 T2 20071206; EP 0716596 A1 19960619; EP 0716596 B1 20070620; EP 0716596 B8 20071003; ES 2288298 T3 20080101; IT 1263394 B 19960805; IT PD930165 A1 19950131; IT PD930165 D0 19930730; PT 716596 E 20070820; US 2002132790 A1 20020919; US 6509322 B2 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-11 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 69434992

- Effective date: 20150611

2015-05-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140730

2015-01-14 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69434992

2015-01-14 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 69434992

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-11-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141120

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140730

2014-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 365033 T

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-08-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140728

2014-07-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69434992

2014-07-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69434992

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130717

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MARIA CLEMENTINE MARTIN KLOSTERFRAU VERTRIEBSGESEL

- Effective date: 20080314

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-03-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070402430

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-02-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100702

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.P.A.

- Free text: FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.P.A.#VIA PONTE DELLA FABBRICA 3/A#35031 ABANO TERME (PADOVA) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.P.A.#VIA PONTE DELLA FABBRICA 3/A#35031 ABANO TERME (PADOVA) (IT)

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080729

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070729

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070730

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MARIA CLEMENTINE MARTIN KLOSTERFRAU VERTRIEBSGESEL

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2288298 T3

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-10-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070402430

2007-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2007-09-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-09-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-08-20 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-08-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69434992 P 20070802

2007-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FIDIA FARMACEUTICI S.P.A.

2007-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT SI

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 9/12 20060101AFI20061113BHEP

2007-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/728 20060101ALI20061113BHEP

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960212

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960212;SI PAYMENT 960212

1996-06-19 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960212;SI PAYMENT 960212