Global Patent Index - EP 0716637 B1

EP 0716637 B1 2001-02-14 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR FORMING AND LABELLING PACKAGING CONTAINERS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR FORMING AND LABELLING PACKAGING CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN UND ETIKETTIEREN VON VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE FORMAGE ET L'ETIQUETAGE DE RECIPIENTS D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 0716637 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95917272 A

Priority

  • DE 9500589 W
  • DE 4417648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4417648A1] A labelling device (20) for labelling cup-shaped packaging containers (11), in which at least one row (12-19) of cup-shaped containers (11) are formed in a plastic foil web (10), has a label magazine in the form or rolls (21) of labels from which labels (22) are removed with the aid of an extraction (25) and transfer device (32) and taken to the packaging containers. The labels are applied to the outer surfaces of the packaging containers (11) by a pressing device (40) after shaping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 3/14; B65C 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/14 (2006.01); B65C 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/14 (2013.01); B65C 9/26 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1705 (2013.01); Y10T 156/171 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4417648 A1 19951123; EP 0716637 A1 19960619; EP 0716637 B1 20010214; ES 2154729 T3 20010416; JP H09500856 A 19970128; US 5879506 A 19990309; WO 9532124 A1 19951130

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050505

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030506

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-05-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154729 T3

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509020 20010322

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR FORMING AND LABELLING PACKAGING CONTAINERS

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960530

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI