Global Patent Index - EP 0716821 B1

EP 0716821 B1 2000-02-09 - Toothbrush

Title (en)

Toothbrush

Title (de)

Bürste für die Zahn- und Körperpflege

Title (fr)

Brosse à dents

Publication

EP 0716821 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117626 A

Priority

DE 4444926 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0716821A1] The ends of the bristles (9) lie on at least two different planes at right angles to the direction in which the bristles extend. At least two tufts (8) of bristles are positioned on a support surface of at most 6 square mm. Either the ends of the bristles of one tuft or the ends of the bristles of adjacent tufts lie on the at least two different planes (10,11,12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0716821 A1 19960619; EP 0716821 B1 20000209; BR 9505909 A 19971223; CA 2163314 A1 19960617; CN 1115120 C 20030723; CN 1133155 A 19961016; DE 4444926 A1 19960627; ES 2142441 T3 20000416; JP H08214947 A 19960827; NO 955045 A 19960617; NO 955045 D0 19951213; PL 178783 B1 20000630; PL 311842 A1 19960624; ZA 9509831 B 19960529

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20030725

2004-01-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030725

2004-01-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20030725

2002-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: INTERBROS GMBH

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BRAUN GMBH

2001-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: INTERBROS GMBH

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BRAUN GMBH

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: M + C SCHIFFER GMBH

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142441

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507780

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980211

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960313

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL