Global Patent Index - EP 0717149 B1

EP 0717149 B1 2000-08-16 - Mixed structure of wood-concrete, especially for the construction of bridge decks

Title (en)

Mixed structure of wood-concrete, especially for the construction of bridge decks

Title (de)

Holz-Beton Verbundkonstruktion, insbesondere für die Herstellung von Brückendecken

Title (fr)

Structure mixte bois-béton destinée notamment à la réalisation de tabliers d'ouvrages d'art

Publication

EP 0717149 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402782 A

Priority

FR 9414975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717149A1] The structure consists of lengthwise timber beams resting on supports, a concrete compression slab supported by the beams, and metal connectors between the beams and the concrete. Each of the connectors has a double bend, forming an upper vertical plate (13) which is embedded in the compression slab, and a lower vertical plate (20) fixed in a slot (21) in the upper surface of the beam. The intermediate section of the connector between the upper and lower plates lies horizontally and is fixed to the beam by bolts (17). The lower vertical plate is sealed into the beam slot by a product which has a good chemical compatibility with the timber, sufficient fluidity to impregnate the fibres, and a thixotropic property to prevent it from spreading where it is not required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/12; E04B 5/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/12 (2006.01); E04B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/125 (2013.01); E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E01D 2101/10 (2013.01); E01D 2101/26 (2013.01); E04B 2005/237 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717149 A1 19960619; EP 0717149 B1 20000816; AT 195563 T 20000915; DE 69518396 D1 20000921; DE 69518396 T2 20010329; FR 2727993 A1 19960614; FR 2727993 B1 19970207

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOPRESE S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518396 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL

2000-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195563 T 20000915

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961217

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL