Global Patent Index - EP 0717158 B1

EP 0717158 B1 2001-05-30 - System of constructional volumes for the erection of buildings

Title (en)

System of constructional volumes for the erection of buildings

Title (de)

Raumbausteinsystem für das Erstellen von Bauwerken

Title (fr)

Système de volumes constructifs pour l'édification de bâtiments

Publication

EP 0717158 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118043 A

Priority

DE 4444921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717158A2] The system has modules of equal height, which form rectangular rooms and also act as supporting structures, and which are made of steel reinforced concrete, or a similar material. The modules each have a floor, a ceiling, and at least three walls. At least one wall has a gap for a door, and this or at least one other wall has a gap for a window. Longitudinal (30) and transverse (30') bars are embedded in the floor and the ceiling, and their ends project from gaps (31') in the edges of these. Tensile anchors (37) can be attached to the projecting ends, in order to connect neighbouring modules, facing elements (22), or balconies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/348; E04H 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/04 (2013.01); E04B 1/34823 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717158 A2 19960619; EP 0717158 A3 19970514; EP 0717158 B1 20010530; AT 201731 T 20010615; DE 4444921 A1 19960627; DE 4444921 C2 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-12-14 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-09-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010926

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509304 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201731 T 20010615

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990820

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970626

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT