Global Patent Index - EP 0717179 B1

EP 0717179 B1 2000-03-22 - Air gap insulation exhaust manifold

Title (en)

Air gap insulation exhaust manifold

Title (de)

Luftspaltisolierter Abgaskrümmer

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'échappement isolé par couche d'air

Publication

EP 0717179 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118922 A

Priority

DE 4444760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717179A1] The manifold (1) is made from sheet metal inner (6) and outer (5) tubing, and has an outlet opening (2) at one end, and lateral inlet openings (4). Exhaust gases are guided by inner tubing only in the regions where they combine with flows from other inlets, and in the region of a single inlet opening are guided only by outer tubing. The inner tubing may be assembled from segments, and these may also have thin walls, in order for their reduced heat capacity to assist with the rapid warming of downstream emission control equipment. It may also be made using a hydrostatic deformation process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10; F01N 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/102 (2013.01); F01N 13/141 (2013.01); F01N 13/1883 (2013.01); F01N 13/1888 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4200611 A1 19930715 - BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717179 A1 19960619; EP 0717179 B1 20000322; DE 4444760 A1 19960620; DE 4444760 C2 20030213

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508049

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011202

2001-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000911

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508049 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980427

1997-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO.

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961025

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE