Global Patent Index - EP 0717200 B1

EP 0717200 B1 2002-11-20 - Cylinder assembly

Title (en)

Cylinder assembly

Title (de)

Zylindereinheit

Title (fr)

Ensemble de cylindre

Publication

EP 0717200 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116659 A

Priority

DE 4445145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717200A2] The piston rod (11) is movable in relation to the piston (6). The mobility of the piston rod in the direction of the pressure exerted on the surface (15) of the piston is restricted by stop pieces (16,18) on the piston and piston rod. The stop pieces are pre-tensioned with pre-set force at least partially by a pre-tensioning spring (14). The piston rod penetrates the piston and has a stop piece (18) opposite the piston surface acting partly as a piston-side stop piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717200 A2 19960619; EP 0717200 A3 19980708; EP 0717200 B1 20021120; DE 4445145 A1 19960620

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091024

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510465 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WABCO GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-08-05 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F15B 15/14

1998-08-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE