Global Patent Index - EP 0717201 B1

EP 0717201 B1 2002-09-11 - Protection system in a pressure installation

Title (en)

Protection system in a pressure installation

Title (de)

Schutzsystem für eine Druckmittelanlage

Title (fr)

Système de protection dans une installation sous pression

Publication

EP 0717201 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116660 A

Priority

DE 4445146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717201A2] The overflow valve for each consumer circuit is enclosed by a direction connection (29,26) which each include a shut-off device (12,19) controlled by the pressures of the two consumer circuits (10,21). When there is a higher pressure in the consumer circuits not allocated to same than in the consumer circuit (10,21) which is allocated to same the shut-off device is switched into the blocking position. At least one of the direct connections has a secondary non-return valve (30,27) which is permeable in the direction of the associated consumer circuit. At least one of the shut-off devices only switches into the shut-off position when there is a predetermined pressure difference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 20/00; B60T 11/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 20/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717201 A2 19960619; EP 0717201 A3 19980701; EP 0717201 B1 20020911; BR 9505889 A 19980106; DE 4445146 A1 19960620

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-10-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59510368

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081023

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510368 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WABCO GMBH & CO. OHG

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE