Global patent index - EP 0717233 B1

EP 0717233 B1 2001-02-07 - Reflector made of thermoplastic material for headlamp, in particular for a motor vehicle headlamp with cut off

Title (en)

Reflector made of thermoplastic material for headlamp, in particular for a motor vehicle headlamp with cut off

Title (de)

Reflektor aus thermoplastischem Material für Scheinwerfer, insbesondere für Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit Hell-Dunkel-Grenze

Title (fr)

Réflecteur en matière thermoplastique pour projecteur en particulier à coupure de véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0717233 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402779 A

Priority

FR 9414917 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717233A1] The thermoplastic reflector has a curvilinear operational part (11), attached to upper and lower walls (12) forming the enclosure for the lamp bulb. The upper wall (12) has an opening (14) extending along the greater part of one half of the headlamp shell where the wall joins the reflector. The opening is shaped so that the thermal expansion of the wall as the lamp grows hot is primarily into the region of the opening, avoiding transmission of thermal distortion to the reflector. The opening is generally triangular in shape, with an edge (15) initially parallel to the optical axis of the lamp, then running diagonally (17) to the front edge (18) of the lamp unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/20; F21V 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 29/15 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717233 A1 19960619; EP 0717233 B1 20010207; DE 69520065 D1 20010315; DE 69520065 T2 20010823; FR 2728056 A1 19960614; FR 2728056 B1 19970307

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2003-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520065

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-02-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 7/20 A, 7F 21V 29/00 B

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990325

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961216

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT