Global Patent Index - EP 0717234 B1

EP 0717234 B1 2001-05-16 - Lighting device with basic element and light cover

Title (en)

Lighting device with basic element and light cover

Title (de)

Leuchte mit Grundelement und Leuchtenaufsatz

Title (fr)

Lampe à élément de base et à vasque lumineuse

Publication

EP 0717234 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119482 A

Priority

DE 4445164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717234A1] The light unit has a universal base incorporating the components (3,4,5,10) for supporting and supplying the lamp and an interchangeable lamp fitting which is snap-fitted to the base. The base has a dished housing (8) with a cover (7) fitting over the lamp supporting and supplying components and made of a material which allows it to act as a reflector, or coated with a reflector material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00; F21V 23/00; G09F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01); F21S 9/02 (2006.01); G09F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21S 9/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); G09F 13/00 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0459 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717234 A1 19960619; EP 0717234 B1 20010516; DE 4445164 A1 19960620; DE 4445164 C2 20020307

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509263

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-07-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130701

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20111228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CEAG NOTLICHTSYSTEME GMBH

2004-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: COOPER CROUSE-HINDS GMBH

2004-11-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-07-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509263 20010621

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 2/00 A, 7F 21V 23/00 B, 7G 09F 13/04 B

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990609

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961206

1996-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL