Global Patent Index - EP 0717256 B1

EP 0717256 B1 2000-03-15 - Firing system by electric arc for a caseless ammunition

Title (en)

Firing system by electric arc for a caseless ammunition

Title (de)

Zündungssystem für hulsenlose Munition durch Verwendung eines Lichtbogens

Title (fr)

Système de mise à feu par arc électrique d'une munition sans douille

Publication

EP 0717256 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402531 A

Priority

FR 9414912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717256A1] The system for firing small calibre ammunition (2) without a cartridge operates by discharge of an electric arc. This is activated near to the cap (4) of the ammunition, with a high tension being applied between two electrodes. The electrode (A) forming the anode is mounted on a support (S) fixed to the back of the chamber (5). This support ensures a seal for the combustion gases and the electrical insulation of the anode (A). The electrode forming the cathode is formed by a metal chamber (5a) within the weapon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/63 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717256 A1 19960619; EP 0717256 B1 20000315; AT 190714 T 20000415; DE 69515614 D1 20000420; DE 69515614 T2 20000706; FR 2728066 A1 19960614; FR 2728066 B1 19970124; US 5608982 A 19970311

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69515614

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 190714 T

- Effective date: 20121113

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515614 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190714 T 20000415

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981021

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960719

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE