Global Patent Index - EP 0717705 A4

EP 0717705 A4 2000-04-26 - LUGGAGE CASE

Title (en)

LUGGAGE CASE

Title (de)

KOFFER

Title (fr)

VALISE

Publication

EP 0717705 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95928251 A

Priority

  • GB 9414354 A
  • US 9509741 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9602424A1] A luggage case comprises a lid shell (11) and a base shell (12) connected together by a hinge (22). The edges of the shells can be fastened together by latches (23, 24, 25). Two latches (23, 24) are mounted on the lid shell at the end walls. When they are released, they project downwardly and outwardly to provide gripping elements for opening the case. The case has two wheels (70, 71) and a steering handle (74) for rolling the case in a two-wheeled mode. Two castors (72, 73) are located on the back wall, and a pulling handle (76) is provided on the front wall. The pulling handle can be used for pulling the case on the wheels and the castors in four-wheeled mode. The carrying handle (21) is fixed to the frame (22) so as not to pivot. It is made of thermoplastic rubber to allow twisting movement for the comfort of the traveller. The latch (25) operates easily under carrying handle (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 5/12; A45C 5/14; A45C 13/26; E05C 5/00; E05C 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 5/00 (2006.01); A45C 5/14 (2006.01); A45C 13/02 (2006.01); A45C 13/26 (2006.01); B65D 25/28 (2006.01); E05B 65/52 (2006.01); E05C 5/00 (2006.01); E05C 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 5/14 (2013.01); A45C 13/02 (2013.01); A45C 13/262 (2013.01); E05B 65/5276 (2013.01); E05C 5/00 (2013.01); E05C 19/14 (2013.01); A45C 5/00 (2013.01); E05B 65/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9602424 A1 19960201; AR 020320 A2 20020508; AT 237246 T 20030515; AU 3208695 A 19960216; AU 692291 B2 19980604; BR 9506052 A 20020430; CA 2171849 A1 19960201; CN 1135710 A 19961113; DE 69530362 D1 20030522; DE 69530362 T2 20031023; DK 0717705 T3 20030616; EP 0717705 A1 19960626; EP 0717705 A4 20000426; EP 0717705 B1 20030416; ES 2196074 T3 20031216; GB 2296709 A 19960710; GB 2296709 B 19981007; GB 9414354 D0 19940907; GB 9605408 D0 19960515; HK 1010976 A1 20000331; JP H09503149 A 19970331; KR 100399296 B1 20031231; MX 9600976 A 19981231; PT 717705 E 20030930; SG 32391 A1 19960813; SG 55285 A1 19981221; SG 68613 A1 19991116; SG 96171 A1 20030523; TW 322421 B 19971211

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAMSONITE CORP.

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040715

2005-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040714

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAMSONITE CORP.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196074 T3

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-08-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030812

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-06-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69530362 P 20030522

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 45C 5/12 A, 6A 45C 5/14 B, 6A 45C 13/26 B, 6E 05C 5/00 B, 6E 05C 19/14 B

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960308

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE