Global Patent Index - EP 0717714 B1

EP 0717714 B1 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING INDIVIDUAL ROLLS OF PACKING MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING INDIVIDUAL ROLLS OF PACKING MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON INDIVIDUELLEN ROLLEN FÜR VERPACKUNGSMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA PRODUCTION DE ROULEAUX SEPARES DE MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 0717714 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94928574 A

Priority

  • US 9410209 W
  • US 11947293 A
  • US 25506294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9507225A2] An expanded paper cylinder formed from a spiral is disclosed as a void fill. A delivery system is provided for manual and automatic delivery of the expanded paper from a continuous, unextended wound roll of an extendible sheet material. The cushioning material formed by the expander can be used as an expanded sheet around an article or as void fill, or can be formed into spiral cylinders for use as void fill. The manual dispensing system includes a support member supporting a rotatable feed roll. A restraining device slows the free delivery of the wound feed roll of unextended sheet material, so that the sheet material expands while it is being drawn, under tension from the feed roll. An automatic system uses expander rollers to expand the slit paper and can be coordinated with apparatus which cuts and forms the spiral cylinders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/03; B21D 31/04; B31D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B31C 5/00 (2006.01); B31D 5/00 (2006.01); B65B 63/04 (2006.01); B65D 81/03 (2006.01); B65D 81/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/006 (2013.01); B31C 5/00 (2013.01); B31D 5/0065 (2013.01); B65D 81/09 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0047 (2013.01); B31D 2205/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9507225 A2 19950316; WO 9507225 A3 19950406; AT 190948 T 20000415; AT 350215 T 20070115; AU 7796094 A 19950327; BR 9407529 A 19970826; CA 2168979 A1 19950316; CA 2168979 C 20081125; CN 1134687 A 19961030; CZ 9600623 A3 19970212; DE 69423634 D1 20000427; DE 69423634 T2 20001123; DE 69434910 D1 20070215; DE 69434910 T2 20070830; DK 0978372 T3 20070514; EP 0717714 A1 19960626; EP 0717714 B1 20000322; EP 0978372 A2 20000209; EP 0978372 A3 20020508; EP 0978372 B1 20070103; ES 2146257 T3 20000801; ES 2281946 T3 20071001; FI 961088 A0 19960308; FI 961088 A 19960308; HK 1026175 A1 20070817; HU 9600584 D0 19960528; JP 3420770 B2 20030630; JP H09502410 A 19970311; NO 960968 A 19960502; NO 960968 D0 19960308; PL 313490 A1 19960708; TW 307713 B 19970611

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *LIBEROPAX LLC7700 CONGRESS AVENUE, SUITE 1107, BO

- Effective date: 20050513

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *LIBEROPAX LLC

- Effective date: 20050513

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LIBEROPAX LLC

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060913

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060912

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060912

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LIBEROPAX, LLC

- Free text: GEOPAX, LTD.#4208 SIX FORKS ROAD SUITE 220 V#RALEIGH, NORTH CAROLINA 27609 (US) -TRANSFER TO- LIBEROPAX, LLC#7700 CONGRESS AVENUE, SUITE 1107#BOCA RATON, FL 33487 (US)

2005-05-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *LIBEROPAX LLC7700 CONGRESS AVENUE, SUITE 1107, BO

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-05-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *LIBEROPAX LLC

- Effective date: 20050513

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-09-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146257 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-06-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423634 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190948 T 20000415

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOODRICH, DAVID P.

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HURWITZ, MICHAEL C.

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JESTER, ROGER E.

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEVINE, JAMES P.

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEOPAX, LTD.

1999-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEOPAX, LTD.

1997-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970307

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960410

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE