Global Patent Index - EP 0717936 B1

EP 0717936 B1 2000-05-03 - Process for flavouring and/or filtering tobacco smoke, filter tip for carrying out such process

Title (en)

Process for flavouring and/or filtering tobacco smoke, filter tip for carrying out such process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Aromatisierung und/oder Filtrierung von Tabakrauch, Zigarettenendstück zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour aromatiser et/ou filtrer la fumée de tabac, embout filtrant pour réaliser ce procédé

Publication

EP 0717936 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810100 A

Priority

CH 391094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717936A1] Free-flowing material supporting aromatising material, or filtration material, is accommodated in a chamber (1) in the cigarette-tip. Before filling the chamber with this material, it is mixed to give maximum homogeneity with free-flowing material inert to the tobacco smoke flowing through. The mixture (2,3) can fill the chamber to the maximum degree, preferably at least 95%. The volume of the inert material can be at least equal to that of the filtering or aromatising one. Alternatively, the proportions can be varied to give the degree of filtration or aromatisation desired.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/163 (2013.01); A24D 3/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717936 A1 19960626; EP 0717936 B1 20000503; CH 687800 A5 19970228; DE 59508268 D1 20000608; US 5896861 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-10-09 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 728Y

2001-10-31 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 728V

2001-10-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR FLAVOURING AND/OR FILTERING TOBACCO SMOKE, FILTER TIP FOR CARRYING OUT SUCH PROCESS

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981105

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-10-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT