Global patent index - EP 0717942 B1

EP 0717942 B1 2000-01-19 - Eyelet

Title (en)

Eyelet

Title (de)

Schnürösen

Title (fr)

Passant pour lacet

Publication

EP 0717942 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95117772 A

Priority

FR 9415819 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717942A1] The mountain boot lace eyelet consists of an external metallic casing (11) having a strong mechanical resistance which is fixed on the boot upper. The casing which is folded to form a rectangular section housing (11a) has a leg (11b) with a rivet hole (11c) for fastening to the boot upper. Two semi-circular notches (11e) are provided in the housing rear wall (11) for the passage of the lace. An insert (12) in the shape of a half pulley has a peripheral semi-circular groove (12b). The insert is fixed inside the casing and its groove forms a passage way for the lace. It has a low coefficient of friction and is made of a synthetic material such as teflon for facilitating sliding. The lace eyelet improves the sliding of the lace.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 3/00; A43C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/00 (2006.01); A43C 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 3/02 (2013.01); A43C 3/00 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3739 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3742 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3768 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717942 A1 19960626; EP 0717942 B1 20000119; EP 0717942 B2 20050413; AT 188847 T 20000215; DE 69514632 D1 20000224; DE 69514632 T2 20000629; DE 69514632 T3 20051006; ES 2141880 T3 20000401; ES 2141880 T5 20050801; FR 2728443 A1 19960628; FR 2728443 B1 19970228; US 5761777 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141112

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 188847

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69514632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-02-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-02-26 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: SALOMON S.A.S.

- Free Format Text: SALOMON S.A.#LIEUDIT LA RAVOIRE#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SALOMON S.A.S.#LES CROISELETS#74370 METZ-TESSY (FR)

2005-08-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Date of Ref Document: 20050425

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-05-25 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-04-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2005-04-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: K2 SKI SPORT + MODE GMBH

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NEIL PRYDE LTD.

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECNICA SPA

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VANS INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-12-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NEIL PRYDE LTD.

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141880

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188847

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980527

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961115

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI