Global Patent Index - EP 0717985 B1

EP 0717985 B1 2001-12-19 - DERMATOLOGIC PREPARATION

Title (en)

DERMATOLOGIC PREPARATION

Title (de)

DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DERMATOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0717985 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95924521 A

Priority

  • JP 17954494 A
  • JP 5814995 A
  • JP 9501360 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9601618A1] A dermatologic preparation comprising at least either an escinol represented by general formula (1) or a salt thereof and having an excellent skin-lightening effect and a high safety in virtue of characteristic effects of the escinol, wherein R<1> represents hydrogen or hydroxy; and R<2> represents a pyranose residue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/00; C07J 53/00; A61K 31/704

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/96 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 36/18 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/16 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/02 (2006.01); C07J 17/00 (2006.01); C07J 53/00 (2006.01); C07J 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 63/008 (2013.01); A61K 8/44 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/97 (2013.01); A61Q 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9601618 A1 19960125; CN 1079666 C 20020227; CN 1130350 A 19960904; DE 69524720 D1 20020131; DE 69524720 T2 20020814; EP 0717985 A1 19960626; EP 0717985 A4 19961106; EP 0717985 B1 20011219; JP 3359774 B2 20021224; JP H0873340 A 19960319; TW 414711 B 20001211; US 5728683 A 19980317

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050707

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050707

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524720 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/48 A, 7A 61K 7/00 B, 7C 07J 53/00 B, 7A 61K 31/704 B

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/48 A, 7A 61K 31/705 B, 7C 07J 53/00 B

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED

1996-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960712

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT